CA AB899 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 668, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 668, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 8.5 (commencing with Section 110962) to Chapter 5 of Part 5 of Division 104 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to food.
Title
Food safety: baby food.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-13 - Assembly - AB 899 Muratsuchi Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB899 Muratsuchi et al. By Skinner (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-08-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - AB 899 Muratsuchi Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Safety and Toxic Materials] (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB899 Muratsuchi et al. By Skinner (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-08-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - AB 899 Muratsuchi Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Safety and Toxic Materials] (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-10 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 668, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-10-10 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-21 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2023-09-13 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3407.). |
2023-09-12 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2023-09-12 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 2. Page 2645.). |
2023-09-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-08 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2023-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (September 1). |
2023-08-14 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file. |
2023-07-13 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-07-12 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 12). |
2023-07-03 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2023-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and E.Q. |
2023-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 0. Page 2087.) |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 18). |
2023-05-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2023-04-12 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2023-03-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2023-03-13 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-13 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-02-23 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and E.S. & T.M. |
2023-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2023-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 110962 | New Code | See Bill Text |