CA AB899 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 709, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 709, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 60811 of, and to add and repeal Section 60811.4 of, the Education Code, relating to academic content standards.
Title
Academic content standards: English language development standards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-09-12 - Assembly - AB 899 WEBER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB899 Weber By Padilla (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-12 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Assembly - AB 899 WEBER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB899 Weber By Padilla (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-12 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Assembly - AB 899 WEBER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-10 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 709, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-10-10 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-09-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2013-09-12 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 3300.). |
2013-09-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2013-09-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 2356.). |
2013-09-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-09-06 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-09-03 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2013-08-13 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2013-07-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-07-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 3). |
2013-06-26 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 5. Page 1756.) |
2013-05-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 24). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-05-15 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2013-05-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-05-06 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2013-05-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 1). |
2013-04-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2013-04-25 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2013-04-03 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-03-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2013-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2013-02-24 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. |
2013-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 60811 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 60811.3 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 60811.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |