CA AB899 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-01 - Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-01 - Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 13 (commencing with Section 1796) to Division 2 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to home care services, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Home Care Services Act of 2011.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-01 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2011-05-27 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. Held under submission. | |
2011-05-12 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-05-11 | Read second time and amended. | |
2011-05-10 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (May 3). | |
2011-05-02 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2011-04-28 | Read second time and amended. | |
2011-04-27 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 26). | |
2011-04-04 | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. | |
2011-03-31 | Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and JUD. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-02-18 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | |
2011-02-17 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1796 | New Code | See Bill Text |