CA AB899 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 484, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 484, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1350.7 and 1365.2.5 of, and to add Section 1363.005 to, the Civil Code, relating to common interest developments.
Title
Common interest developments: disclosures.
Sponsors
Asm. Mike Eng [D] | Sen. Norma Torres [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-08-27 - Assembly - AB 899 TORRES Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB899 Torres By Lowenthal (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - AB 899 TORRES Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB899 Torres By Lowenthal (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - AB 899 TORRES Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 484, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2009-09-02 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:15 p.m. | |
2009-08-27 | Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2754.) | |
2009-08-25 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2009-08-24 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1917.) | |
2009-06-26 | Read second time, amended, and to third reading. (Corrected July 22.) | |
2009-06-25 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 23). | |
2009-06-17 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |
2009-06-11 | Referred to Com. on T. & H. | |
2009-05-28 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-05-28 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1728.) | |
2009-05-26 | Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading. (Page 1664.). | |
2009-05-14 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-05-13 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (May 13). | |
2009-04-02 | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2009-04-01 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. | |
2009-03-31 | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. | |
2009-02-27 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. | |
2009-02-26 | Read first time. To print. |