CA AB898 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 358, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 358, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1202.4 of the Penal Code, relating to crime victims, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Crime victims: restitution: fine.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-09-07 - Assembly - AB 898 ALEJO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-09-06 - Senate - Special Consent #9 AB898 Alejo By Cannella (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Assembly - AB 898 ALEJO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-06 - Senate - Special Consent #9 AB898 Alejo By Cannella (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Assembly - AB 898 ALEJO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 358, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-09-19 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. | |
2011-09-07 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2978.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3010.). | |
2011-09-06 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2320.). | |
2011-08-31 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | |
2011-08-30 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-29 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 25). | |
2011-07-13 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-07-11 | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-06-28 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-06-08 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2011-06-01 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-06-01 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1746.) | |
2011-05-31 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-27 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-05-18 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-05-11 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-05-10 | Read second time and amended. | |
2011-05-09 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 3). | |
2011-04-25 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2011-03-14 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2011-02-18 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | |
2011-02-17 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1202.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |