CA AB896 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 494, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 494, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1506 to the Fish and Game Code, relating to wildlife management.
Title
Wildlife management areas: mosquito abatement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-26 - Assembly - AB 896 EGGMAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB896 Eggman By Wolk (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Assembly - AB 896 EGGMAN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB896 Eggman By Wolk (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Assembly - AB 896 EGGMAN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-20 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 494, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-20 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-05 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2014-08-26 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6444.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 1. Page 6457.). |
2014-08-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 3. Page 4760.). |
2014-08-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2014-06-23 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-06-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-03-11 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2014-01-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-01-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3727.) |
2014-01-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (January 23). Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-01-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-03-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W.,P. & W. |
2013-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2013-02-24 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. |
2013-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Fish and Game Code | 1506 | New Code | See Bill Text |