CA AB896 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 260, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 260, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend and repeal Section 14105.18 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to health care.
Title
Health care programs: provider reimbursement rates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-09-12 - Assembly - AB 896 GALGIANI Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-12 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE AB896 Galgiani By Alquist (Y: 29 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-29 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-17 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-01 - Assembly - AB 896 GALGIANI Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-12 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE AB896 Galgiani By Alquist (Y: 29 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-29 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-17 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-01 - Assembly - AB 896 GALGIANI Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 260, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2009-09-28 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. | |
2009-09-12 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 3410.) | |
2009-09-12 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 7. Page 2460.) | |
2009-09-11 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on third reading file. | |
2009-09-10 | Read second time. To third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Senate Rule 29.3 suspended. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2009-09-09 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on second reading file. | |
2009-09-08 | Senate Rule 29.3 suspended. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 2280.) From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-08-27 | In committee: Held under submission. | |
2009-06-29 | In committee: Placed on Appropriations suspense file. | |
2009-06-18 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (June 17). | |
2009-06-11 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2009-06-02 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-06-01 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1851.) | |
2009-05-29 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-04-29 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2009-04-15 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 14). | |
2009-03-23 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2009-02-27 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. | |
2009-02-26 | Read first time. To print. |