CA AB893 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 731, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 731, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 4158 to the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to agricultural districts.
Title
22nd District Agricultural Association: firearm and ammunition sales at the Del Mar Fairgrounds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-11 - Assembly - AB 893 Gloria Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 55 N: 21 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB893 Gloria et al. By Atkins (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Assembly - AB 893 Gloria Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 22 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB893 Gloria et al. By Atkins (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Assembly - AB 893 Gloria Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 22 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 731, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-23 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 55. Noes 21. Page 3412.). |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3370.) |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 12 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 2748.). |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-09-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30). |
2019-06-24 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 22. Page 1348.) |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (April 3). |
2019-04-03 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2019-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Food and Agricultural Code | 4158 | New Code | See Bill Text |