CA AB893 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-08-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-08-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 63035 of, and to add Section 63037 to, the Government Code, relating to state government.
Title
State government: California infrastructure and economic
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-08-15 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Governmental Organization (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Assembly - AB 893 PEREZ, V.M. Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Governmental Organization (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Assembly - AB 893 PEREZ, V.M. Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-25 | In committee: Held under submission. | |
2011-07-05 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-06-28 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-06-22 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | |
2011-06-16 | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and G.O. | |
2011-06-02 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-06-02 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 24. Page 1819.) | |
2011-06-01 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-31 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-05-27 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-05-18 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2011-05-11 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-05-10 | Read second time and amended. | |
2011-05-09 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (May 3). | |
2011-04-26 | Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D. & E. | |
2011-04-25 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D. & E. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-03-14 | Referred to Com. on J., E.D. & E. | |
2011-02-18 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | |
2011-02-17 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 16724 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 63010 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 63021.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 63022 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 63024 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 63027.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 63035 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 63037 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 63040 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 63050 | Amended Code | Citation Text |