CA AB890 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 472, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 472, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 22228 of the Education Code, and to add and repeal Section 20136 of the Government Code, relating to public retirement systems.
Title
Public employee retirement systems: investment management: reports.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB890 Cervantes et al. By Bradford (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-07-15 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 890 Cervantes Assembly Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 10 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-15 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 890 Cervantes Assembly Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 10 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-04 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 472, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-10-04 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-01 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 8. Page 2117.). |
2021-08-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-07-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 15). |
2021-07-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 10. Page 1773.) |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (May 20). |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-05-03 | Assembly | Received by the Desk April 30 pursuant to Joint Rule 61(a)(2). |
2021-05-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2021-03-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2021-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 22228 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 20136 | New Code | See Bill Text |