CA AB89 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 182, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 182, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 2915.4 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to psychologists.
Title
Psychologists: suicide prevention training.
Sponsors
Asm. Marc Levine [D] | Asm. Marc Berman [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB89 Levine et al. By Hill (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Assembly - AB 89 LEVINE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Assembly - AB 89 LEVINE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-01 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 182, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-09-01 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-08-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2017-08-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2017-08-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 2174.). |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 1. Page 1130.) |
2017-04-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-04-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 5). |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-22 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2017-01-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2017-01-10 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 9. |
2017-01-09 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 2915.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |