CA AB89 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 390, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 390, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 31485.10 of the Government Code, relating to county employees' retirement, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
County employees' retirement.
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Hill [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-09-08 - Assembly - AB 89 HILL Concurrence- Urgency Added (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-09-07 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB89 Hill Urgency Clause (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB89 Hill Urgency Clause (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-15 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - Assembly - AB 89 HILL Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-07 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB89 Hill Urgency Clause (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB89 Hill Urgency Clause (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-15 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - Assembly - AB 89 HILL Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-02 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 390, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-10-02 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-09-21 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2011-09-08 | Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3054.). | |
2011-09-07 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. | |
2011-09-07 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2360.). | |
2011-09-06 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-09-02 | Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-09-02 | In Senate. Held at Desk. | |
2011-09-02 | Ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-08-31 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2011-08-30 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2132.). | |
2011-08-23 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-22 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-08-17 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-16 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 15). | |
2011-06-28 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-06-23 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. | |
2011-06-02 | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. | |
2011-05-26 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-05-26 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1567.) | |
2011-05-19 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-05-18 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 18). | |
2011-05-10 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-05-09 | Read second time and amended. | |
2011-05-05 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 4). | |
2011-04-25 | Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S. | |
2011-04-14 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-01-27 | Referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S. | |
2011-01-07 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 6. | |
2011-01-06 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 31485.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 7503.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |