CA AB889 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Died on third reading file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Died on third reading file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1002 of the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to secrecy agreements.
Title
Secrecy agreements.
Sponsors
Asm. Mark Stone [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Assembly | Died on third reading file. |
2018-01-29 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 3851.) |
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 3716.) |
2018-01-04 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-01-04 | Assembly | From inactive file. |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Mark Stone. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Mark Stone. |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1854.) |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 69(b) suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 23. Page 1851.) |
2017-05-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (May 2). |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2017-04-06 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2017-04-05 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (April 4). |
2017-04-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-03-30 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and P. & C.P. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2017-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 1002 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 1002.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |