CA AB888 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on September 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 575, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on September 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 575, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 320.6 of the Penal Code, relating to gaming, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Charitable raffles.
Sponsors
Asm. Evan Low [D] | Asm. Autumn Burke [D] | Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D] | Sen. Jerry Hill [D] |
Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D] | Asm. Ash Kalra [D] | Asm. Jay Obernolte [R] | Sen. Jeff Stone [R] |
Sen. Scott Wiener [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-31 - Assembly - AB 888 Low Concurrence - Urgency Added (Y: 61 N: 11 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB888 Low et al. By Wiener Urgency Clause (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Assembly - AB 888 LOW Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-04 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Business and Professions] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB888 Low et al. By Wiener Urgency Clause (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Assembly - AB 888 LOW Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-04 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Business and Professions] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-20 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 575, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-20 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2018-08-31 | Assembly | Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2018-08-31 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 14. Noes 2.) (August 31). |
2018-08-31 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. |
2018-08-31 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2018-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 3. Page 6080.). |
2018-08-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16). |
2018-08-06 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-07-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 26). |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2018-05-31 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-01-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 3868.) |
2018-01-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-01-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (January 18). |
2018-01-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (January 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-01-04 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on B. & P. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (January 4). Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2017-03-14 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2017-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 2847.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 2876 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 69433.91 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 320.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |