CA AB888 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 594, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 594, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 5.9 (commencing with Section 42360) to Part 3 of Division 30 of the Public Resources Code, relating to waste management.
Title
Waste management: plastic microbeads.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-08 - Assembly - AB 888 BLOOM Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 64 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-09-04 - Senate - Assembly 2nd Reading AB888 Bloom By Hueso (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB888 Bloom By Hueso (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB888 Bloom By Hueso (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-06-30 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-22 - Assembly - AB 888 BLOOM Assembly Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Environmental Safety and Toxic Materials (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-09-04 - Senate - Assembly 2nd Reading AB888 Bloom By Hueso (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB888 Bloom By Hueso (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB888 Bloom By Hueso (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-06-30 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-22 - Assembly - AB 888 BLOOM Assembly Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Environmental Safety and Toxic Materials (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 594, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-17 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. |
2015-09-08 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 64. Noes 12. Page 2958.). |
2015-09-04 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 6 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2015-09-04 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Senate Rule 29.3 (a) suspended. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 2506.) Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 2507.). |
2015-09-03 | Senate | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 19. Noes 16. Page 2483.). Motion to reconsider made by Senator Hueso. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2483.) Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-09-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-09-01 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-07-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-07-13 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2015-07-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and JUD. |
2015-05-22 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 12. Page 1546.) |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 13). |
2015-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2015-04-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2015-04-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2015-03-16 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and E.S. & T.M. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. |
2015-02-26 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 42360 | New Code | See Bill Text |