CA AB887 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 719, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 51 of the Civil Code, to amend Sections 200, 210.2, 210.7, 220, 32228, 47605.6, 51007, 66260.6, 66260.7, and 66270 of the Education Code, to amend Sections 12920, 12921, 12926, 12930, 12931, 12935, 12940, 12944, 12949, 12955, 12955.8, 12956.1, and 12956.2 of the Government Code, to amend Sections 676.10, 10140, 10140.2, and 12693.28 of the Insurance Code, to amend Section 3600 of the Labor Code, and to amend Sections 186.21, 422.56, 422.85, 3053.4, and 11410 of the Penal Code, relating to gender.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Gender.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-09-02 - Assembly - AB 887 ATKINS Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 51 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB887 Atkins By Padilla (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - Assembly - AB 887 ATKINS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-10-09 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 719, Statutes of 2011.
2011-10-09 Approved by the Governor.
2011-09-13 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
2011-09-02 Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 2843.).
2011-08-31 In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2011-08-30 Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 13. Page 2130.).
2011-08-18 Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2011-08-17 Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2011-07-12 Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2011-07-11 From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2011-06-21 In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2011-06-21 Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2011-06-16 Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2011-06-14 From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2011-05-26 Referred to Com. on JUD.
2011-05-16 In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2011-05-16 Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 24. Page 1388.)
2011-05-09 Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2011-05-05 From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 4).
2011-04-28 Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2011-04-27 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
2011-04-05 From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2011-03-30 Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2011-03-29 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
2011-03-10 Referred to Com. on JUD.
2011-02-18 From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
2011-02-17 Read first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Civil Code51Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code200Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code210.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code210.7Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code220Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code32228Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code47605.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code51007Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code66260.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code66260.7Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code66270Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code12920Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code12921Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code12926Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code12930Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code12931Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code12935Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code12940Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code12944Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code12949Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code12955Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code12955.8Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code12956.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code12956.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code10140Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code10140.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code12693.28Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code676.10Amended CodeCitation Text
Labor Code3600Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code11410Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code186.21Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code3053.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code422.56Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code422.85Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_887&sess=1112&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0851-0900/ab_887_bill_20110217_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0851-0900/ab_887_bill_20110329_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0851-0900/ab_887_bill_20110427_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0851-0900/ab_887_bill_20110817_amended_sen_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0851-0900/ab_887_bill_20110908_enrolled.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0851-0900/ab_887_bill_20110908_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0851-0900/ab_887_bill_20111009_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0851-0900/ab_887_vote_20110405_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0851-0900/ab_887_vote_20110504_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0851-0900/ab_887_vote_20110516_0133PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0851-0900/ab_887_vote_20110614_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0851-0900/ab_887_vote_20110830_1118AM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0851-0900/ab_887_vote_20110902_1156AM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback