CA AB885 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-04 - From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-04 - From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 12804.13 to the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Vehicles: driver's licenses and identification cards:
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Berryhill [R] | Asm. Paul Cook [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-04 | From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | |
2011-04-11 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage. | |
2011-04-05 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2011-04-04 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-03-14 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2011-02-18 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | |
2011-02-17 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 12804.13 | New Code | See Bill Text |