CA AB880 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 409, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 409, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1626.6 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to dentistry.
Title
Dentistry: licensure: exemption.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-08-31 - Assembly - AB 880 RIDLEY-THOMAS Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB880 Ridley-Thomas By Hall (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Assembly - AB 880 RIDLEY-THOMAS Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB880 Ridley-Thomas By Hall (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Assembly - AB 880 RIDLEY-THOMAS Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-01 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 409, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-01 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2015-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2675.). |
2015-08-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2015-08-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2202.). |
2015-08-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-18 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-07-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-07-13 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 29). |
2015-06-22 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2015-05-14 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1449.) |
2015-05-07 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2015-05-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 6). |
2015-04-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-28 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 21). |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. |
2015-02-26 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 1625 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 1626.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |