CA AB88 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-07 - Referred to Com. on PUB S.
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 1172.1 and 3043 of the Penal Code, relating to crime victims.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal procedure: victims’ rights.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-26 - Assembly - AB 88 Sanchez Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-07SenateReferred to Com. on PUB S.
2023-05-26SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2023-05-26AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0.)
2023-05-18AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2023-05-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 18).
2023-03-22AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2023-02-14AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (February 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-02-14AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2023-01-26AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2023-01-05AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 4.
2023-01-04AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code1172.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code3043Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback