CA AB88 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 12, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 12, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 17131.11 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, to amend Sections 8150 and 8151 of, and to add Chapter 4.6 (commencing with Section 8152) to Division 8 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to COVID-19 relief, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
One-time stimulus and grant payments: garnishment: exclusion from gross income.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-15 - Assembly - AB 88 BUDGET Concurrence in Senate Amendments By TING (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB88 BUDGET (Ting) By Skinner (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - Assembly - AB 88 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 13 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB88 BUDGET (Ting) By Skinner (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - Assembly - AB 88 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 13 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 12, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-03-17 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-03-15 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:40 p.m. | |
2021-03-15 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 66. Noes 0. Page 649.). |
2021-03-15 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. |
2021-03-15 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. |
2021-03-15 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after March 17 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0.). |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Senate Rule 29 suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 0.) |
2021-03-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (March 15). |
2021-03-08 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (February 18). |
2021-02-18 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2021-01-15 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-01-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 13. Page 164.) |
2021-01-12 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | (Ayes 46. Noes 13. Page 108.) |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | Without reference to committee. |
2020-12-08 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 7. |
2020-12-07 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17131.11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 8150 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 8151 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 8152 | New Code | See Bill Text |