CA AB88 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 30, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 30, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 6727 to the Government Code, relating to state observances.
Title
Nowrūz Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-19 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB88 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Assembly - AB 88 NAZARIAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Assembly - AB 88 NAZARIAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 30, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-06-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-06-26 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 1611.). |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2017-06-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 13). |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 721.) |
2017-03-21 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | From Consent Calendar by request of Assembly Member Nazarian. To Third Reading. |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2017-03-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (March 15). |
2017-01-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2017-01-10 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 9. |
2017-01-09 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 6727 | New Code | See Bill Text |