CA AB88 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-01 - From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-01 - From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 110756 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to food labeling.
Title
Food labeling: genetically engineered food.
Sponsors
Asm. Michael Allen [D] | Asm. Tom Ammiano [D] | Asm. Wesley Chesbro [D] | Asm. Jared Huffman [D] |
Sen. William Monning [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-01-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-05-18 - Assembly - Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2011-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Assembly - Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2011-05-18 - Assembly - Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2011-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Assembly - Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-01 | From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | |
2012-01-19 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage. | |
2011-05-27 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2011-05-18 | In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | |
2011-05-04 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 6.) (May 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-04-26 | In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | |
2011-03-22 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2011-03-21 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-01-07 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 6. | |
2011-01-06 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 110756 | New Code | See Bill Text |