CA AB875 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 4011.11 of the Penal Code, and to amend Sections 14184.10, 14184.30, 14184.40, and 14197.4 of, and to add Sections 14184.300, 14184.301, and 14184.600 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Medi-Cal: demonstration project.
Sponsors
Asm. Jim Wood [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2022-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1460.) |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-05-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2021-04-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-04-12 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2021-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 4011.11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14184.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14184.30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14184.300 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14184.301 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14184.40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14184.600 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14197.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |