CA AB873 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 138, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 830.11 of the Penal Code, relating to peace officers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Food and Agriculture: commercial cannabis activity inspectors: peace officer duties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-07-05 - Assembly - AB 873 LACKEY Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB873 Lackey et al. By Wilk (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Assembly - AB 873 LACKEY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-20 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 138, Statutes of 2018.
2018-07-20 Approved by the Governor.
2018-07-10AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2018-07-05AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 6102.).
2018-07-03AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-07-02SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5043.).
2018-06-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-06-25SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-06-13SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-19SenateRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-04-10SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-04-10SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2018-04-09SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2017-06-28SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-06-08SenateReferred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2017-05-30SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1829.)
2017-05-26AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 26).
2017-04-26AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-04-06AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-03-20AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2017-03-02AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. GOV.
2017-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2017-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code830.11Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code98Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback