CA AB87 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-26 - Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
Pending: Senate Budget and Fiscal Review Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-26 - Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
Pending: Senate Budget and Fiscal Review Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 8879.52, 14460, 14461, 16321, and 64000 of, to add Sections 14462, 14463, and 64001 to, and to repeal Division 2 (commencing with Section 64000) of Title 6.7 of, the Government Code, to add Section 7105.1 to the Revenue and Taxation Code, and to amend Sections 5066 and 9400.4 of the Vehicle Code, relating to transportation, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Transportation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Assembly - AB 87 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 13 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Assembly - AB 87 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 13 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-26 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (June 12). |
2019-06-11 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 13. Page 1171.) |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 15. Page 1032.) |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2018-12-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 3. |
2018-12-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 14460 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 14461 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 14462 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 14463 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 16321 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 64000 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 64001 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 8879.52 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 7105.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 5066 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 9400.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |