CA AB87 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-16 - Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 22651 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicles: removal: autonomous vehicles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB87 Ting et al. By Allen (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Assembly - AB 87 TING Assembly Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 27 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Communications and Conveyance] (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-16AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on TRANS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
2018-08-14AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 16 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-08-13SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-08-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-06SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-08-06SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-12SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-06-04SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
2018-04-19SenateReferred to Coms. on T. & H. and PUB. S.
2018-01-29SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-01-29AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 27. Page 3853.)
2018-01-22AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-01-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (January 18).
2018-01-11AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 4.) (January 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-01-09AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on C. & C. (Ayes 9. Noes 4.) (January 8). Re-referred to Com. on C. & C.
2018-01-04AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2018-01-03Assembly(pending re-refer to Com. on C. & C.)
2018-01-03AssemblyAssembly Rule 56 suspended.
2018-01-03AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-20AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-01-19AssemblyReferred to Coms. on TRANS. and C. & C.
2017-01-06AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 5.
2017-01-05AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Vehicle Code22651Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code38750Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback