CA AB862 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Title 15.9 (commencing with Section 97016) to the Government Code, relating to corrections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Social innovation financing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Assembly - AB 862 MAIENSCHEIN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-15SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-03-21SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-03-15SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-01-29SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-01-29AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3855.)
2018-01-22AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-01-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (January 18).
2018-01-18AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-01-09AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (January 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-03-27AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-03-23AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-23AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2017-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback