CA AB86 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-07-10 - In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Article 7 (commencing with Section 12100.1) of Chapter 1.6 of Part 2 of Division 3 of Title 2 of the Government Code, relating to state government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Government innovation fellows program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Assembly - AB 86 CALDERON Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-10SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-06-27SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-06-20SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
2017-06-01SenateReferred to Com. on G.O.
2017-05-18SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-18AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 1616.)
2017-05-11AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2017-05-10AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 10).
2017-04-25AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-24AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
2017-04-06AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-05AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2017-04-04AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 28).
2017-03-23AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2017-01-19AssemblyReferred to Com. on J., E.D., & E.
2017-01-06AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 5.
2017-01-05AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code12100.1New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback