CA AB856 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 123, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 123, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Article 13.3 (commencing with Section 33477) of Chapter 3 of Part 20 of Division 2 of Title 2 of the Education Code, relating to pupil health, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Pupil health: COVID-19 Youth Health Information Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-07-15 - Assembly - AB 856 Maienschein Concurrence - Urgency Added By REYES (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB856 Maienschein By Portantino Urgency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Assembly - AB 856 Maienschein Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB856 Maienschein By Portantino Urgency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Assembly - AB 856 Maienschein Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 123, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-07-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-07-16 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. | |
2021-07-15 | Assembly | Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 2371.). |
2021-07-12 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 14 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2021-07-12 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1905.). |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1154.) |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-04-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 14). |
2021-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-05 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-29 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 24). |
2021-03-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2021-03-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-18 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on ED. and HEALTH. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2021-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 33477 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |