CA AB855 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-31 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Glazer.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-31 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Glazer.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 2105 of the Elections Code, relating to elections.
Title
Voter registration: regulations.
Sponsors
Asm. Evan Low [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Assembly - AB 855 LOW Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 21 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Assembly - AB 855 LOW Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 21 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-31 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Glazer. |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2018-06-21 | Senate | From inactive file. |
2017-09-16 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator McGuire. |
2017-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 1). |
2017-06-26 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (June 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 21. Page 1304.) |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (April 26). |
2017-04-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2017-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 2105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |