CA AB851 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 821, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 821, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 20146 and 21162 of, and to add Section 22162.5 to, and to add and repeal Section 20175 of, the Public Contract Code, relating to public contracts.
Title
Local agency contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-15 - Assembly - AB 851 CABALLERO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-14 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB851 Caballero et al. By Hill (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-12 - Senate - That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. Ordered to third reading (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Assembly - AB 851 CABALLERO Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-14 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB851 Caballero et al. By Hill (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-12 - Senate - That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. Ordered to third reading (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Assembly - AB 851 CABALLERO Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-15 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 821, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-15 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-26 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2017-09-15 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3503.). |
2017-09-14 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (September 14). |
2017-09-14 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3371.) |
2017-09-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2017-09-14 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2017-09-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2857.). |
2017-09-12 | Senate | From committee: That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (September 12) |
2017-09-11 | Senate | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b). (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b). |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-07 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-08-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-29 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-07-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-07-17 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2017-07-10 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-22 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1857.) |
2017-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2017-05-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 24). |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-05-10 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2017-03-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2017-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Contract Code | 20146 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 20175 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 21162 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 22161 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 22162.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |