CA AB849 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-15 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-15 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 452.5 to the Penal Code, relating to crimes.
Title
Crimes: causing an explosion.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-02 - Assembly - AB 849 BONILLA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB849 Bonilla By Bates (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-22 - Assembly - AB 849 BONILLA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB849 Bonilla By Bates (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-22 - Assembly - AB 849 BONILLA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-15 | Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. | |
2015-10-03 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2015-09-15 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2015-09-02 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2795.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2797.). |
2015-09-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2015-09-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2374.). |
2015-08-31 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-27 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 27). |
2015-08-17 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-07-16 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 14). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-05-22 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1562.) |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2015-05-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 13). |
2015-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-04 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 28). |
2015-04-14 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-03-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. |
2015-02-26 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 452 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 452.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 452.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |