CA AB848 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on October 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 844, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 3.9 (commencing with Section 12147) to Part 2 of Division 2 of the Public Contract Code, relating to public contracts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public contracts: University of California: California State University: domestic workers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-13 - Assembly - AB 848 McCarty Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 59 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB848 McCarty et al. By Lara (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Assembly - AB 848 MCCARTY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Accountability and Administrative Review] (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-15 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 844, Statutes of 2017.
2017-10-15 Approved by the Governor.
2017-09-20AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
2017-09-13AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 59. Noes 19. Page 3316.).
2017-09-13AssemblyAssembly Rule 77(a) suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 3255.)
2017-09-13AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2017-09-12SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 6. Page 2782.).
2017-09-11SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-08SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2017-09-05SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-01SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2017-09-01SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (September 1).
2017-08-21SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-07-12SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-07-11SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 5).
2017-06-26SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
2017-06-13SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-06-08SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2017-05-30SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 18. Page 1778.)
2017-05-11AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-10AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 3.) (May 10).
2017-04-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-20AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
2017-04-19AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended.
2017-04-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. (Ayes 8. Noes 4.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
2017-04-06AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2017-04-05AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-02AssemblyReferred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and A. & A.R.
2017-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2017-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code5703Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Contract Code12147New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback