CA AB840 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 820, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 3019 and 15360 of the Elections Code, relating to elections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections: vote by mail and provisional ballots.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-15 - Assembly - AB 840 QUIRK Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-14 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB840 Quirk et al. By Leyva (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Assembly - AB 840 QUIRK Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-15 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 820, Statutes of 2017.
2017-10-15 Approved by the Governor.
2017-09-26AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2017-09-15AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3501.).
2017-09-14AssemblyFrom committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (September 14).
2017-09-13AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3273.)
2017-09-13AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on E. & R. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
2017-09-13AssemblyAssembly Rule 77(a) suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 3255.)
2017-09-13AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2017-09-12SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2740.).
2017-09-11SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-07SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2017-08-28SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-08-24SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2017-06-27SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-06-26SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2017-06-06SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-23SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2017-05-10SenateReferred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2017-04-20SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-04-20AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1144.)
2017-04-06AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2017-04-05AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 5).
2017-04-05AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2017-03-29AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-03-28AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2017-03-27AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 22).
2017-03-02AssemblyReferred to Com. on E. & R.
2017-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2017-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Elections Code15360Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code3019Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback