CA AB84 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-27 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Monning.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 84200.6, 85205, and 85702 of, and to add Section 84200.10 to, the Government Code, relating to the Political Reform Act of 1974, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Political Reform Act of 1974: political party committee disclosures.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Assembly - AB 84 MULLIN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 20 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-27SenateOrdered to inactive file at the request of Senator Monning.
2018-08-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-16SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-08-14SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (August 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-08-08SenateRe-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2018-08-06SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-08-06SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
2018-08-06SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-07-05SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2018-07-05SenateOrdered to second reading.
2018-07-05SenateFrom inactive file.
2017-08-31SenateOrdered to inactive file at the request of Senator Lara.
2017-07-17SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-07-13SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (July 12).
2017-06-05SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-05-18SenateReferred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2017-05-04SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-04AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 20. Page 1382.)
2017-05-01AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-04-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 26).
2017-04-20AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on E. & R.
2017-04-19AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on E. & R.
2017-03-21AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-20AssemblyReferred to Com. on E. & R.
2017-01-06AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 5.
2017-01-05AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback