CA AB84 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 296 and 300 of, and to amend and add Sections 293 and 294 of, the Penal Code, relating to DNA samples.
Title
Forensic testing: DNA samples.
Sponsors
Asm. Mike Gatto [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2016-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2015-05-13 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-04-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-23 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-22 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 14). |
2015-04-07 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-01-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-01-07 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 6. |
2015-01-06 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 293 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 294 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 295.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 296 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 298 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 299 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 300 | Amended Code | Citation Text |