CA AB834 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-01 - Died on inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-01 - Died on inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 53069.86 to the Government Code, relating to local government.
Title
Local government: contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-16 - Assembly - AB 834 HERNANDEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [FAIL]
2011-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-01 | Died on inactive file. | |
2011-06-03 | Reconsideration granted. (Page 1853.) Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Roger Hernández. | |
2011-05-17 | June 2-Motion to reconsider continued. | |
2011-05-16 | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 28. Noes 26. Page 1395.). Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Roger Hernández. | |
2011-05-02 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-04-28 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 27). | |
2011-04-25 | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2011-04-14 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-03-10 | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2011-02-18 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | |
2011-02-17 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 53069.86 | New Code | See Bill Text |