CA AB830 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-06-07 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Jun 26 @ 10:00 am in John L. Burton Hearing Room
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 8421, 8423, 8484.1, 10805, 33126, 47605, 48070.6, 48800, 48980, 49600, 52052, 52302.8, 52335.12, 60605.6, 60900, 99222, 99223, 99224, and 99225 of, to add Section 51413 to, and to repeal Chapter 9 (commencing with Section 60850) of Part 33 of Division 4 of Title 2 of, the Education Code, to amend Section 11126 of the Government Code, and to amend Section 14530 of the Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to the high school exit examination.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

High school exit examination.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-07 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Assembly - AB 830 KALRA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 17 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-07SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-18SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2017-05-04SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-04AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 17. Page 1377.)
2017-04-27AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-04-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (April 26).
2017-04-24AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-20AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
2017-04-06AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-03-27AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on ED.
2017-03-23AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-23AssemblyReferred to Com. on ED.
2017-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2017-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code10805Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code33126Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code47605Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code48070.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code48800Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code48980Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code49600Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code51413New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code52052Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code52302.8Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code52335.12Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code60605.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code60850Repealed CodeCitation Text
Education Code60900Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code8421Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code8423Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code8484.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code99222Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code99223Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code99224Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code99225Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code11126Amended CodeCitation Text
Unemployment Insurance Code14530Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback