CA AB83 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 16 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Lee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 85320 of, and to add Section 82007.5 to, the Government Code, relating to the Political Reform Act of 1974.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Political Reform Act of 1974: contributions and expenditures by foreign-influenced business entities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-01AssemblyOrdered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Lee.
2023-05-18AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2023-05-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (May 18).
2023-03-29AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
2023-03-15AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (March 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-01-26AssemblyReferred to Com. on ELECTIONS.
2023-01-04AssemblyRead first time.
2022-12-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 16.
2022-12-16AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code82007.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code85320Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback