CA AB83 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 15 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-24 - Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
Pending: Senate Budget and Fiscal Review Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 23320.3 to, and to add and repeal Section 7427 of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to business and professions, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholic beverage control: barbering and cosmetology: license renewal fees: waiver.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - Assembly - AB 83 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 13 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-24SenateRe-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2021-02-18SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-02-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (February 18).
2021-02-17SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2021-02-16SenateJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended.
2021-01-25SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2021-01-15SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-01-15AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2021-01-12AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-01-11AssemblyOrdered to second reading.
2021-01-11AssemblyWithout reference to committee.
2020-12-08AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 7.
2020-12-07AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code23320.3New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code7427Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback