CA AB83 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 835, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 10.4 (commencing with Section 3524.50) to Division 4 of Title 1 of the Government Code, relating to the Judicial Council.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Collective bargaining: Judicial Council.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-14 - Assembly - AB 83 SANTIAGO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 54 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-13 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB83 Santiago By Wiener (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 83 SANTIAGO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 23 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-15 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 835, Statutes of 2017.
2017-10-15 Approved by the Governor.
2017-09-25AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
2017-09-14AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 3384.).
2017-09-13AssemblyFrom committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (September 13).
2017-09-12AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3206.)
2017-09-12AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
2017-09-11AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 13 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2017-09-11SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 2716.).
2017-09-05SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-01SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2017-09-01SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 1).
2017-08-21SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-07-12SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-06-29SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2017-06-27SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2017-06-20SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
2017-06-14SenateReferred to Coms. on P.E. & R. and JUD.
2017-06-01SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 23. Page 1902.)
2017-05-30AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 26).
2017-04-26AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-03-29AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-01-19AssemblyReferred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
2017-01-06AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 5.
2017-01-05AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code3513Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code3522.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code3524.50New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback