CA AB83 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1798.81.5 of the Civil Code, relating to personal data.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Personal data.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-08-24 - Senate - From Committee: That the measure be returned to the Senate floor for consideration (Y: 2 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-07-07 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - Assembly - AB 83 GATTO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-11-30SenateFrom committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
2016-08-24SenateIn committee: Failed passage.
2016-08-22SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b). From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b). (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2016-08-19SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2016-08-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2016-08-08SenateFrom inactive file. Ordered to second reading.
2015-09-09SenateOrdered to inactive file at the request of Senator Jackson.
2015-07-15SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2015-07-14SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 7).
2015-06-25SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2015-05-21SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2015-05-07SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2015-05-07AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 4. Page 1339.)
2015-05-04AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-04-30AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 30).
2015-04-28AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
2015-04-27AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
2015-04-20AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2015-04-15AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2015-04-06AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
2015-03-26AssemblyReferred to Com. on P. & C.P. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
2015-01-07AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 6.
2015-01-06AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Civil Code1798.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code1798.81.5Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_83&sess=1516&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_83_bill_20150106_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_83_bill_20150326_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_83_bill_20150427_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_83_bill_20150625_amended_sen_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_83_bill_20150715_amended_sen_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_83_bill_20160819_amended_sen_v94.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_83_vote_20150430_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_83_vote_20150507_0951AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_83_vote_20150707_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_83_vote_20160824_000001_sen_comm.html

Bill Comments

feedback