CA AB829 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 13956 of the Government Code, to add Sections 186.36, 186.38, 186.40, 186.42, 186.44, 186.460, 186.462, 186.464, 186.466, 186.468, 186.470, 186.472, 186.474, 186.476, and 186.478 to, to add the headings of Article 1 (commencing with Section 186.20), Article 2 (commencing with Section 186.22), Article 3 (commencing with Section 186.30), and Article 4 (commencing with Section 186.34) to Chapter 11 of Title 7 of Part 1 to, and to repeal and add Section 186.34 of, the Penal Code, relating to gangs.
Title
Gangs: shared gang databases.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2015-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2016-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2015-04-28 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. |
2015-02-26 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 13956 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 13825.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 186.36 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 186.38 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 186.40 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 186.42 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 186.44 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 186.460 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 186.462 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 186.464 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 186.466 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 186.468 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 186.470 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 186.472 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 186.474 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 186.476 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 186.478 | New Code | See Bill Text |