CA AB823 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-30 - In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-30 - In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 4640.6 and 4696.1 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to developmental services.
Title
Developmental services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-30 - Assembly - AB 823 Arambula Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-01-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 3941.) |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (January 23). |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (January 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-01-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2020-01-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2019-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4640.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4696.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |