CA AB820 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 207, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 207, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 162 of, and to add Section 162.1 to, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.
Title
Property taxation: fee: preparation of certificate.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-08-18 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB820 Gordon By Wolk (Y: 21 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB820 Gordon Reconsider (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB820 Gordon By Wolk (Y: 20 N: 16 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-06-29 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Assembly - AB 820 GORDON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-07-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB820 Gordon Reconsider (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB820 Gordon By Wolk (Y: 20 N: 16 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-06-29 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Assembly - AB 820 GORDON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-01 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 207, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-09-01 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-08-24 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. | |
2011-08-18 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |
2011-08-18 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 17. Page 1959.). | |
2011-07-11 | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 20. Noes 16. Page 1784.). Motion to reconsider made by Senator Wolk. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1784.) | |
2011-06-30 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-06-29 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 29). | |
2011-06-15 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2011-05-19 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |
2011-05-05 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-05-05 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 22. Page 1238.) | |
2011-04-27 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-04-26 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 25). | |
2011-04-11 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2011-03-10 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |
2011-02-18 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | |
2011-02-17 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 162 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 162.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |