CA AB82 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-09 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Sections 102134 and 103227 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to vital records.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vital records: diacritical marks.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-14 - Assembly - AB 82 Medina Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 69 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB82 Medina et al. By Lara (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 82 MEDINA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 2 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-09 Vetoed by Governor.
2017-09-25AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
2017-09-14AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 69. Noes 2. Page 3390.).
2017-09-14AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2017-09-13SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 1. Page 2847.).
2017-09-05SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-01SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2017-09-01SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1).
2017-08-21SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-07-13SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-06-14SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2017-06-01SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 2. Page 1950.)
2017-05-30AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-30AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 24. Page 1776.)
2017-05-30AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2017-05-26AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 26).
2017-04-26AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-03-22AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-01-19AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2017-01-06AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 5.
2017-01-05AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code102134New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code103227New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback