CA AB819 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 716, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 891 of, and to add and repeal Section 891.1 of, the Streets and Highways Code, relating to bikeways.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Bikeways.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-08-22 - Assembly - AB 819 WIECKOWSKI Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 55 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-08-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB819 Wieckowski By Rubio (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - Assembly - AB 819 WIECKOWSKI Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-09-28 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 716, Statutes of 2012.
2012-09-28 Approved by the Governor.
2012-08-30 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
2012-08-22 Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 55. Noes 23. Page 6094.).
2012-08-20 In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2012-08-20 Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 5. Page 4584.).
2012-08-14 Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2012-08-13 From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 6).
2012-08-06 Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2012-07-06 From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 3).
2012-06-12 In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2012-05-25 In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2012-05-08 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
2012-05-03 In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2012-02-16 Referred to Com. on T. & H.
2012-01-26 In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2012-01-26 Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 21. Page 3594.)
2012-01-23 Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2012-01-19 In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (January 19).
2012-01-12 Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2012-01-11 Read second time and amended.
2012-01-10 From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (January 9).
2012-01-04 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2011-04-04 Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2011-03-31 Referred to Com. on TRANS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
2011-02-18 From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
2011-02-17 Read first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_819&sess=1112&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0801-0850/ab_819_bill_20110217_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0801-0850/ab_819_bill_20110331_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0801-0850/ab_819_bill_20120104_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0801-0850/ab_819_bill_20120111_amended_asm_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0801-0850/ab_819_bill_20120508_amended_sen_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0801-0850/ab_819_bill_20120806_amended_sen_v94.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0801-0850/ab_819_bill_20120814_amended_sen_v93.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0801-0850/ab_819_bill_20120827_enrolled.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0801-0850/ab_819_bill_20120827_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0801-0850/ab_819_bill_20120928_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0801-0850/ab_819_vote_20120109_000003_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0801-0850/ab_819_vote_20120119_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0801-0850/ab_819_vote_20120126_0932AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0801-0850/ab_819_vote_20120703_000005_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0801-0850/ab_819_vote_20120806_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0801-0850/ab_819_vote_20120820_0418PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0801-0850/ab_819_vote_20120822_1041AM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback