CA AB818 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 590, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Part 9 (commencing with Section 49650) to Division 30 of, and to repeal Section 49652 of, the Public Resources Code, relating to solid waste.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Solid waste: premoistened nonwoven disposable wipes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-01 - Assembly - AB 818 Bloom Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-08-30 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB818 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Assembly - AB 818 Bloom Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-06 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 590, Statutes of 2021.
2021-10-06 Approved by the Governor.
2021-09-08 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
2021-09-01AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0.).
2021-09-01AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 16.)
2021-08-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2021-08-30SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.).
2021-08-16SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2021-07-15SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
2021-07-01SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-06-30SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 1717.) (June 29).
2021-06-14SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2021-05-27SenateReferred to Coms. on E.Q. and JUD.
2021-05-13SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-05-13AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1409.)
2021-05-06AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2021-05-05AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 5).
2021-05-05AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2021-04-13AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-07AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2021-02-25AssemblyReferred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and JUD.
2021-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2021-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code49650New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code49652Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback