CA AB816 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 456, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 456, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 6929 of, and to add Section 6929.1 to, the Family Code, relating to minors.
Title
Minors: consent to medical care.
Sponsors
Asm. Matt Haney [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-09-12 - Assembly - AB 816 Haney Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 64 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB816 Haney By Wiener (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Assembly - AB 816 Haney Assembly Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB816 Haney By Wiener (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Assembly - AB 816 Haney Assembly Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 456, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-19 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2023-09-12 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 64. Noes 6. Page 3311.). |
2023-09-12 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3228.) |
2023-09-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 13 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2023-09-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 2579.). |
2023-09-06 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-05 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2023-06-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-06-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (June 20). |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-05-16 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 0. Page 1543.) |
2023-03-29 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-03-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 28). |
2023-02-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2023-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Family Code | 6929 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Family Code | 6929.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |