CA AB815 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1682.7 of the Labor Code, relating to employment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Farm labor contractors.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-01AssemblyFrom committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2018-01-31AssemblyDied pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
2017-05-26AssemblyIn committee: Held under submission.
2017-04-26AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-03-30AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-03-02AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. & E.
2017-02-16AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
2017-02-15AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Labor Code1682.7Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback